Accounts and annual returns MARSH LADIES CHOIR

Charity number: 1121233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 11 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required