BECKERY ISLAND REGENERATION TRUST

Charity number: 1120490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 July 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 January 2020 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 May 2018 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 31 May 2018 365 days late Download