Financial history THE ADDO TRUST

Charity number: 1119947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.99k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £5.65k £4.81k £4.79k £9.77k £31.72k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A