KATHMANDU CONTEMPORARY ARTS CENTRE

Charity number: 1121118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £5.83k £484 £940 £1.70k £17.75k
Total expenditure £6.33k £1.89k £1.08k £625 £893
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A