Accounts and annual returns Northants Community Aid

Charity number: 1120895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 February 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window