Financial history Northants Community Aid

Charity number: 1120895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £45.33k £21.94k £21.72k £3.70k £721
Total expenditure £20.26k £24.03k £23.94k £16.92k £17.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A