NEW HEIGHTS WARREN FARM COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1120869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £174.94k £226.92k £308.02k £261.29k £250.33k
Total expenditure £140.64k £188.38k £255.25k £248.14k £239.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.00k N/A N/A £12.24k