MOROCCAN YOUTH UK

Charity number: 1120032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required