Financial history ST JUDE INDIA CHILDCARE CENTRES UNITED KINGDOM (SJICC UK)

Charity number: 1120539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £86.83k £172.98k £186.87k £226.36k £170.28k
Total expenditure £96.45k £194.20k £122.19k £277.21k £1.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A