Accounts and annual returns CARE IN ACTION

Charity number: 1122116
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window