THE FOCUS TRUST

Charity number: 1121613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 14 March 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 14 March 2021 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 29 February 2020 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 17 July 2018 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 17 July 2018 504 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required