GARW VALLEY TENNIS CLUB

Charity number: 1133163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2020 13 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2019 05 August 2020 217 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2018 23 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 09 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required