GARW VALLEY TENNIS CLUB

Charity number: 1133163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 01/03/2018 01/03/2019 01/03/2020
Total gross income £4.39k £4.39k £9.90k £5.87k £5.65k
Total expenditure £1.77k £1.77k £8.71k £2.11k £2.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A