ADHAR PROJECT

Charity number: 1121499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £466.28k £361.96k £294.31k £194.01k £212.95k
Total expenditure £379.40k £364.06k £286.38k £189.84k £264.45k
Income from government contracts £305.21k £206.58k £103.29k £15.20k N/A
Income from government grants £28.76k £0 £102.39k £15.20k N/A