Accounts and annual returns ACTIVITIES 4 CHILDREN (SHEFFIELD)LIMITED

Charity number: 1120466
Charity reporting is overdue by 1504 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 408 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 408 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 774 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 774 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1139 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1139 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1504 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1504 days