BRISTOL REFUGEE RIGHTS

Charity number: 1126646
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 04 January 2017 On time Download