Trustees THE LATVIAN WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1124661
Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Girts Lerhs Trustee 20 March 2022
None on record
Juris Voitkevics Trustee 02 October 2021
LATVIAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION 1990
Received: On time
Ella Osa Trustee 02 October 2021
None on record
Baiba Freimane Trustee 08 March 2020
LATVIAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION 1990
Received: On time
Edite Brauele Trustee 16 January 2019
None on record
Miks Vizbulis Trustee 12 March 2017
None on record
ULDIS JANIS REVELINS Trustee 21 August 2016
None on record
Karoline Isabella Zobens East Trustee 11 June 2016
None on record
ILZE GRICKUS Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record