ONE FAMILY GLOBAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
None start yet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Ethiopia
- India
- Nepal
- Pakistan
Governance
- 09 July 2007: Standard registration
- ILOVELOVE ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARIF BANNA | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|||||
FATYMA KHATUN | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
HASEENA AKHTAR HUMAYRA | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.42k | £247.25k | £230.07k | £423.85k | £180.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £458.42k | £245.39k | £234.00k | £420.23k | £196.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 March 2025 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 14 March 2025 | 379 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 April 2022 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 April 2022 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED ON 01 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF AFRICA AO WORK FOR:- A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
One Family
Queen Elizabeth Olympic Park
Plexal Innovation Centre
14 East Bay Lane
London
E15 2GW
- Phone:
- 07958406277
- Email:
- info@onefamily.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window