Accounts and annual returns WHEELS FOR WELLBEING

Charity number: 1120905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window