Financial history WHEELS FOR WELLBEING

Charity number: 1120905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £268.49k £384.91k £232.53k £198.18k £373.02k
Total expenditure £259.16k £330.91k £267.69k £235.45k £295.58k
Income from government contracts £23.21k £27.60k £23.98k £8.69k N/A
Income from government grants £32.83k £28.93k £31.69k £29.24k £79.35k