FRIENDS OF LIVERPOOL MONUMENTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to become a resource to be used by the people who have an interest in Liverpool's monuments & the stories behind them. Carry out research into the less well known monuments and publish our findings on the web (liverpoolmonuments.co.uk), Clean, maintain, preserve and protect monuments. Give talks, lectures, produce leaflets and hold debates on and about Liverpool monuments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 23 July 2007: Standard registration
- 24 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.65k | £226 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.77k | £1.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN LIVERPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF MERSEYSIDE, WHICH AREA SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT'. I TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT; II TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; III TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window