RIVIERA CONCERT BRASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music Concerts for Charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Torbay
Governance
- 10 January 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony John Stevens | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Cunningham | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY MICHAEL EDIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL DAVID GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DESMOND LAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.19k | £930 | £14.06k | £971 | £2.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.56k | £2.03k | £5.76k | £6.97k | £2.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF BRASS BAND MUSIC THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND BY GIVING INSTRUMENTAL TUITION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, DEVON, CORNWALL, TORBAY AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
338 Totnes Road
PAIGNTON
Devon
TQ4 7HD
- Phone:
- 07885990781
- Email:
- ajstevens8@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
rivieraconcertbrass.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window