AYESHA COMMUNITY EDUCATION

Charity number: 1121317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/07/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £175.90k £201.56k £234.92k £40.96k £9.74k
Total expenditure £171.28k £281.20k £281.33k £43.85k £19.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £82.72k £11.17k £152.49k N/A N/A