Financial history LIGHT4LIFE

Charity number: 1123383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £67.57k £213.03k £94.22k £16.35k £34.08k
Total expenditure £67.02k £202.96k £98.48k £26.59k £23.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A