DENKYIRAMAN ASSOCIATION OF UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Provision of financial assistance for educational resources like desks, whiteboards and blackboards, books and skills development for deprived children and young people 2. Provision of resources and equipments for local hospitals such as surgical equipment, beds and wheelchairs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Ghana
Governance
- 24 January 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Ayeh | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Awotwe | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Albert Opoku-Frimpong | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Boateng | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
ISAAC ADU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.76k | £8.59k | £7.92k | £8.05k | £8.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £6.16k | £7.08k | £7.42k | £7.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, SKILLS AND CAPACITY OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES, INCLUDING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE DENKYIRAMAN TRADITIONAL AREA IN GHANA IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR PEOPLE LIVING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY WITHIN THE DENKYLRAMAN TRADITIONAL AREAS OF GHANA.
Area of benefit
GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 MANCHESTER ROAD
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 8NH
- Phone:
- 07904143168
- Email:
- denkyiraman@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window