Financial history HARLEY VILLAGE MISSION ROOMS TRUST

Charity number: 1120389
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.97k £35.26k £73.80k £29.68k £43.04k
Total expenditure £3.85k £30.41k £87.09k £18.96k £8.09k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A £825 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £903 £1.10k £1.00k £26.78k