Financial history CFYDC (CHANCE)

Charity number: 1121341
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £179.36k £258.23k £340.59k £364.89k £205.12k
Total expenditure £89.24k £184.77k £251.73k £357.96k £358.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £71.68k N/A
Income from government grants £40.10k £99.80k £126.69k £114.45k £41.23k