Accounts and annual returns THE DRONFIELD HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1120875
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 December 2024 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 December 2024 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 December 2024 414 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 December 2024 414 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 July 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 19 July 2022 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 June 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 01 June 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window