Financial history THE DRONFIELD HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1120875
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £170.56k £214.47k £214.51k £189.10k £190.22k
Total expenditure £178.65k £151.60k £169.38k £165.73k £164.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k