Trustees THE DRONFIELD HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1120875
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN ANDREW POWELL Chair 29 July 2014
DERBYSHIRE LAW CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
Ryan Holmes Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Angela Claire Carannante Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
WALTER CAMPBELL Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Joyce Emmens Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
Brian Simpson Trustee 29 July 2014
PEEL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST (CIO)
Received: On time
Ann Brown Trustee 02 September 2012
None on record
DENISE SMILLIE Trustee
PEEL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST (CIO)
Received: On time