ASH WALES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASH Wales is the leading organisation working towards a smokefree Wales. Working on projects, campaigns and policy in order to achieve a reduction in, and eventual elimination of, the health problems associated with smoking and tobacco use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £146,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 13 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Price | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Spear | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Phillips | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Graham Moore | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate Thompson | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Wilkinson | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Poole | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.58k | £303.86k | £301.68k | £320.94k | £289.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £274.01k | £254.47k | £276.11k | £281.78k | £308.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £146.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 10 MAY 2007, 8 AUGUST 2007 AND 15 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN WALES WHO ARE THOSE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PRACTISING OR LIKELY TO PRACTICE CIGARETTE OR OTHER FORM OF SMOKING BY: (I) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OT THE PUBLIC IN WALES CONCERNING THE EFFECTS OF CIGARETTE AND OTHER FORMS OF SMOKING AND THEIR EFFECTS ON THE HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY AND THE INDIVIDUALS; (II) ASSISTING, CARRYING OUT, PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING RESEARCH INTO CIGARETTE AND OTHER FORMS OF SMOKING AND TO COLLECT AND STUDY INFORMATION RELATING THERETO WITH A VIEW TO THE PUBLICATION OF THE SAME AND THE COMMUNICATION OF INFORMATION IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND OTHERS HAVING A LEGITIMATE INTEREST IN RECEIVING SUCH INFORMATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE; (III) ALERTING THE PUBLIC TO THE DANGERS OF TOBACCO USE AND TO SEEK TO PREVENT THE DISABILITY AND DEATH WHICH IT CAUSES.
Area of benefit
IN WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Hollybush Rise
CARDIFF
CF23 6TG
- Phone:
- 02920490621
- Email:
- enquiries@ashwales.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window