AKSHAR COMMUNITY CARE LTD

Charity number: 1123325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.80k £17.07k £25.64k £17.26k £13.64k
Total expenditure £17.48k £22.44k £20.65k £23.45k £19.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A