AFK COMMUNITY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1123299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 April 2018 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required