AFK COMMUNITY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1123299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.95k £2.45k £5.35k £8.57k £8.57k
Total expenditure £8.55k £2.17k £4.58k £6.50k £7.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A