15TH NORWICH AIR SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1121186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

provides activities for boys and girls aged 6 to 14years such as camping,canoeing,team building,archery,and all activities in accordance with the scouting association.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £12,471
Total expenditure: £17,756

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 October 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Payne Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Melanie Hambidge Trustee 01 December 2014
None on record
Melanie Kershaw Trustee 01 December 2014
None on record
Simon Tubby Trustee 08 April 2014
None on record
Trevor Kershaw Trustee 17 November 2013
None on record
Simon Alexander Trustee 13 October 2013
NORFOLK & SUFFOLK 4X4 RESPONSE
Received: On time
Tony Coxall Trustee 06 June 2011
None on record
Gavin Warnes Trustee 25 March 2009
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.62k £23.04k £18.13k £11.66k £12.47k
Total expenditure £17.45k £7.24k £9.11k £14.70k £17.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.91k £11.47k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 February 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 Padgate
Thorpe End
NORWICH
NR13 5DG
Phone:
07788814707
Website:

No information available