Trustees 15TH NORWICH AIR SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1121186

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Payne | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Hambidge | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Kershaw | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tubby | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Kershaw | Trustee | 17 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Simon Alexander | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Tony Coxall | Trustee | 06 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Warnes | Trustee | 25 March 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.