FRIENDS OF ST KEYNA PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1130206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 August 2020 10 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 August 2019 11 January 2021 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 August 2018 13 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 August 2017 07 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 14 August 2016 19 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2016 Not Required