THE WORLD FEDERATION FOR NEURO-REHABILITATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of The World Federation For Neuro Rehabilitation (WFNR) is to advance the development of neurological rehabilitation worldwide and to inspire, encourage and develop collaboration between clinicians with an interest in the field. The WFNR produces a newsletter (update), holds a world congress every two years, sponsors meetings and has established a 'flying faculty'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Belarus
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- China
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- India
- Indonesia
- Italy
- Japan
- Mexico
- Moldova
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Philippines
- Poland
- Romania
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 14 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emeritus Professor Pamela Mary Enderby | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stephanie Clarke | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR M BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.20k | £17.53k | £125.51k | £46.26k | £193.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.68k | £121.74k | £124.73k | £126.50k | £132.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (ADOPTED) 21 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGHOUT THE WORLD (AREA OF BENEFIT), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) ADVANCING THE DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION ACROSS THE WORLD. B) STIMULATING COLLABORATION BETWEEN CLINICIANS AND OTHERS WITH AN INTEREST IN NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION C)FACILITATING EXCHANGE OF KNOWLEDGE AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH BETWEEN CLINICIANS AND OTHERS WITH AN INTEREST IN NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 11
Rake House Farm
Rake Lane
North Shields
NE29 8EQ
- Phone:
- 01912595547
- Email:
- traceymole@wfnr.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window