GHANAIAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 August 2020 30 June 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2018 06 January 2020 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 07 August 2016 14 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 August 2016 Not Required