GHANAIAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 07/08/2016 07/08/2017 07/08/2018 07/08/2019 07/08/2020
Total gross income £292 £300 £392 £392 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A