Community First Support Network

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education to preserve and protect the health, life and property of the public in England and Wales. By promoting the issues, services and equipment relating to fire safety and other support to any person in need involved in, or affected by fire or other related emergencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 June 2008: Standard registration
- CLEVELAND FIRE SUPPORT NETWORK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAIN WILLIAM KAY | Chair | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
EDDIE BUCK | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN NORMAN DODDS | Trustee | 20 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.91k | £41.04k | £70.17k | £33.07k | £5.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.61k | £53.70k | £82.60k | £45.65k | £1.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 350 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 NOV 2017 as amended on 24 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH, LIFE AND PROPERTY OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROMOTING THE ISSUES, SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT RELATING TO FIRE SAFETY AND OTHER SUPPORT TO ANY PERSON IN NEED INVOLVED IN, OR AFFECTED BY FIRE OR OTHER RELATED EMERGENCIES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Collin Avenue
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS4 3HF
- Phone:
- 07977511479
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window