CHRISTIAN ACTION UK

Charity number: 1120576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required