CHRISTIAN ACTION UK

Charity number: 1120576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.21k £5.82k £2.70k £6.04k £3.74k
Total expenditure £13 £1.50k £20.01k £13 £13
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A