Accounts and annual returns THE FREEDOM OF SPIRIT TRUST FOR BORDER COLLIES

Charity number: 1121598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 03 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 03 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 28 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 09 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 24 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window