Financial history THE FREEDOM OF SPIRIT TRUST FOR BORDER COLLIES

Charity number: 1121598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £70.21k £85.46k £104.93k £136.70k £773.81k
Total expenditure £74.36k £78.66k £83.85k £108.32k £115.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £768.91k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.58k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.32k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £625.04k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £112.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.26k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0