Accounts and annual returns PICTURE PEOPLE

Charity number: 1125716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 27 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 27 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window