Financial history CONGO CHILDREN TRUST

Charity number: 1121048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £73.76k £151.91k £142.63k £199.85k £188.39k
Total expenditure £79.00k £125.90k £134.75k £205.76k £205.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A