Hasdei Avot Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing grants and donations for individuals and charitable associations, bodies and organisations, for the purpose of advancing education, relieving poverty, sickness and the needs of the elderly and disabled.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 November 2007: Standard registration
- GEMS ADVISORS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- HASDEI AVOT (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIGUEL GERARDO ABADI | Trustee |
|
||||||
FABIANA RESNIK DE ABADI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL PHILLIP LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £375.19k | £340.84k | £471.87k | £317.99k | £273.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £477.52k | £352.73k | £400.55k | £1.12m | £488.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 OCTOBER 2007. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME OF 19 DECEMBER 2007. as amended on 05 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR INDIVIDUALS OR SUCH CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS, FOR THE PURPOSES OF ADVANCING JEWISH EDUCATION, RELIEVING POVERTY, SICKNESS AND THE NEEDS OF THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED, AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
923 FINCHLEY ROAD
LONDON
NW11 7PE
- Phone:
- 02082090159
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window