CUNNINGHAM HILL INFANT SCHOOL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1122193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 August 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 August 2019 01 July 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 11 August 2018 05 September 2019 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 11 August 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 11 August 2016 08 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 August 2016 Not Required