CUNNINGHAM HILL INFANT SCHOOL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1122193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 11/08/2016 11/08/2017 11/08/2018 11/08/2019 11/08/2020
Total gross income £10.17k £10.34k £13.64k £21.54k £11.60k
Total expenditure £4.87k £10.97k £6.45k £11.75k £7.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A